TN SB2565 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires insurance companies that provide personal private passenger automobile insurance policies that exclude commercial transportation services to notify insureds in writing of such exclusion; requires insured to sign the notice acknowledging such exclusion. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 12 and Title 56.
Title
As introduced, requires insurance companies that provide personal private passenger automobile insurance policies that exclude commercial transportation services to notify insureds in writing of such exclusion; requires insured to sign the notice acknowledging such exclusion. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 12 and Title 56.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2806 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Casualty Subcommittee of Insurance Committee