TN SB2563 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a Class A misdemeanor of violating a condition of release on bail; authorizes a law enforcement officer to arrest a person without a warrant based on probable cause to believe that the person has violated a condition of release. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, relative to conditions of release.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 75, Nays 17, PNV 1 |
2024-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 4 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0915) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0999) |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/9/2024 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1641 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-22 - Comp. SB subst.