TN SB2559 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 817
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 817
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires health care providers to report injuries that appear to result from an illegal female genital mutilation. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, requires health care providers to report injuries that appear to result from an illegal female genital mutilation. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - S. H&W COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - S. H&W COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 817 | |
2012-05-04 | Effective date(s) 07/01/12 | |
2012-04-26 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-13 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2012-04-12 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-04-12 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-04-11 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2012-04-11 | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0 | |
2012-04-11 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2012-03-15 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2012-03-12 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2012-03-12 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2012-03-08 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/12/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/7/2012 | |
2012-01-23 | P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm. | |
2012-01-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2664 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 817