TN SB2549 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 759
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 759
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires former and current district attorneys general, in order to solemnize the rite of matrimony, to opt in by filing notice of intention to solemnize the rite of matrimony with the office of vital records. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 3, relative to marriage officiants.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 759 | |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2537 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2024