TN SB2538 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 625
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 625
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes qualified aliens enumerated in federal law to apply for a funeral director's license or an apprentice registration; deletes an obsolete provision in the code concerning licensees from 1951. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, authorizes qualified aliens enumerated in federal law to apply for a funeral director's license or an apprentice registration; deletes an obsolete provision in the code concerning licensees from 1951. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Powers [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommend for passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommend for passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 625 | |
2020-03-26 | Effective date(s) 03/25/2020 | |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-03-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2020-03-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-12 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/9/2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2784 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 625