TN SB2534 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the semester hours required to be eligible for the HOPE scholarship from 120 semester hours to 132 semester hours and from 136 semester hours to 148 semester hours. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
As introduced, increases the semester hours required to be eligible for the HOPE scholarship from 120 semester hours to 132 semester hours and from 136 semester hours to 148 semester hours. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2014 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2423 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-25 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2534&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB2534.pdf |