TN SB2514 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 638
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, prohibits health care prescribers from certain types of solicitation within 30 days of an accident or disaster. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 1, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, prohibits health care prescribers from certain types of solicitation within 30 days of an accident or disaster. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 1, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-27 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-06 Pub. Ch. 638
2018-04-06 Effective date(s) 07/01/2018
2018-04-02SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-03-21SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-03-20HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-03-19SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-03-15SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-03-15HousePassed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-03-15HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0804)
2018-03-15HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-03-12HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2018-03-08SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-03-08SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2018-03-08SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0642)
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/8/2018
2018-02-27SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/27/2018
2018-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1879 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 638

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback