TN SB2484 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a local beer board from imposing a fine or penalty on a licensee based solely on the fact that the alcoholic beverage commission imposed a fine or penalty; authorizes local governments to set the amount of the application fee for a beer permit and the privilege tax on beer. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
As introduced, prohibits a local beer board from imposing a fine or penalty on a licensee based solely on the fact that the alcoholic beverage commission imposed a fine or penalty; authorizes local governments to set the amount of the application fee for a beer permit and the privilege tax on beer. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1645 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee