TN SB2467 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes misrepresenting the total price of goods or services in an advertisement, including, but not limited to, failing to include mandatory costs and fees in the advertisement when representing the price for which the goods or services are offered an unfair or deceptive act under the Consumer Protection Act of 1977. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18.
Title
As introduced, makes misrepresenting the total price of goods or services in an advertisement, including, but not limited to, failing to include mandatory costs and fees in the advertisement when representing the price for which the goods or services are offered an unfair or deceptive act under the Consumer Protection Act of 1977. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | Deferred to Summer Study |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/15/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2549 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-23 - Def. to Summer Study
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2467&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB2467.pdf |