TN SB2421 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 825
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 825
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes various changes to the controlled substance monitoring database. - Amends TCA Title 53, Chapter 10, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 53, Chapter 10, Part 3, relative to prescription safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 825 | |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2171 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-25 - Effective date(s) 04/14/2022