TN SB2421 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Pub. Ch. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Pub. Ch. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts "Erin's Law", which requires the departments of education and children's services to work together to enhance or adapt curriculum materials that focus on child sexual abuse, including such abuse which may occur in the child’s home. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1; Title 37, Chapter 5; Title 49, Chapter 10 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, enacts "Erin's Law", which requires the departments of education and children's services to work together to enhance or adapt curriculum materials that focus on child sexual abuse, including such abuse which may occur in the child’s home. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1; Title 37, Chapter 5; Title 49, Chapter 10 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Overbey [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | House | Pub. Ch. 706 |
2014-04-22 | House | Effective date(s) 07/01/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-04-03 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-04-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-03-28 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-03-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0 |
2014-03-27 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1006) |
2014-03-27 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0775) |
2014-03-27 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0816) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0888) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/20/2014 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/12/2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2014 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2294 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 706