TN SB2421 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 900
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 900
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes any county, subject to appropriation by the county legislative body, to provide vehicles for the use of any salaried county official described above, or, in the alternative, to provide a monthly car allowance to such salaried county official. - Amends TCA Section 8-26-113.
Title
As enacted, authorizes any county, subject to appropriation by the county legislative body, to provide vehicles for the use of any salaried county official described above, or, in the alternative, to provide a monthly car allowance to such salaried county official. - Amends TCA Section 8-26-113.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 900 | |
2012-04-12 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2012-04-11 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/12/2012 | |
2012-04-11 | S. Reset on cal. for 4/12/2012 | |
2012-04-09 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/11/2012 | |
2012-04-03 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm.2 cal. for 4/3/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-01-18 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2012-01-13 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2403 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 900