TN SB2413 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 845
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 845
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires any landlord registering in Davidson County to provide the landlord's or their agent's physical address to the department of codes and building safety; also requires the landlord, or their agent, to notify the department if any such information changes, or if ownership of the dwelling units changes, within 30 days of such change. - Amends TCA Title 13; Title 29, Chapter 3; Title 37; Title 39; Title 40; Title 55 and Title 66, Chapter 28.
Title
As enacted, requires any landlord registering in Davidson County to provide the landlord's or their agent's physical address to the department of codes and building safety; also requires the landlord, or their agent, to notify the department if any such information changes, or if ownership of the dwelling units changes, within 30 days of such change. - Amends TCA Title 13; Title 29, Chapter 3; Title 37; Title 39; Title 40; Title 55 and Title 66, Chapter 28.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - S. C&L COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - S. C&L COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Pub. Ch. 845 |
2014-05-16 | House | Effective date(s) 04/28/2014 |
2014-04-29 | House | Governor returned. |
2014-04-16 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-04-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-15 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-14 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-10 | House | S. concurred in H. am. 1 |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-09 | House | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-07 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0 |
2014-04-07 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1051) |
2014-04-07 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2276 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 845