TN SB2406 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Effective date(s) 05/03/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Effective date(s) 05/03/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions relative to computer science education. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to computer science education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Effective date(s) 05/03/2022 | |
2022-05-06 | Pub. Ch. 979 | |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-14 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0633) |
2022-04-14 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-24 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0522) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2153 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 979