TN SB2387 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-18 - P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm.
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-18 - P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm.
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, designates titles and related qualifications concerning interns and level I and II alcohol and drug abuse counselors under statute for licensing alcohol and drug abuse counselors. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 24, Part 6.
Title
As introduced, designates titles and related qualifications concerning interns and level I and II alcohol and drug abuse counselors under statute for licensing alcohol and drug abuse counselors. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 24, Part 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-18 | P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm. | |
2012-01-13 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2233 (Crossfiled) 2012-02-21 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c HHR Subcommittee of Health & Human Resources Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2387&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB2387.pdf |