TN SB2387 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-25 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-25 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires person convicted of aggravated robbery with a deadly weapon and especially aggravated robbery to be sentenced to community supervision for life; requires GPS monitoring of such person during term of supervision. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, requires person convicted of aggravated robbery with a deadly weapon and especially aggravated robbery to be sentenced to community supervision for life; requires GPS monitoring of such person during term of supervision. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-25 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2010-01-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-12-01 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2566 (Crossfiled) 2010-01-27 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee for review--Judiciary
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2387&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2387.pdf |