TN SB2377 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Effective date(s) 06/03/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Effective date(s) 06/03/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the Tennessee sheriffs' association to provide a criminal proceedings notification system, as a three-year pilot program that will begin July 1, 2022, and end June 30, 2025, for the purpose of increasing the transparency and efficiency of the criminal justice process by providing timely information about each stage of the criminal process to interested parties; requires that the criminal proceedings notification system be available 24 hours a day over the telephone, through the internet, or by email. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 16; Title 40 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8; Title 16; Title 40 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 6, relative to notification systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Effective date(s) 06/03/2022 | |
2022-06-06 | Pub. Ch. 1140 | |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-27 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0810) |
2022-04-27 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1015) |
2022-04-27 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0598) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0949) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0949) |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/19/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2367 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1140