TN SB2369 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 613
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 613
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates civil right of action for victims of human trafficking offenses. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, creates civil right of action for victims of human trafficking offenses. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 613 | |
2012-03-12 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2012-03-12 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2012-03-08 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/12/2012 | |
2012-03-06 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-28 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/28/2012 | |
2012-02-21 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/28/2012 | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/21/2012 | |
2012-02-14 | Action def. in S. Jud. Comm. to 2/21/12 | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/14/2012 | |
2012-01-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2012-01-13 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2489 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-29 - Pub. Ch. 613