TN SB2349 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes electronic filing of annual report to appropriate committees of the general assembly made by advisory committee responsible for guiding department of health on department's birth defects registry. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 2; Title 39; Title 43; Title 53, Chapter 11; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, authorizes electronic filing of annual report to appropriate committees of the general assembly made by advisory committee responsible for guiding department of health on department's birth defects registry. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 2; Title 39; Title 43; Title 53, Chapter 11; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2540 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-14 - Failed in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee