TN SB2340 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Effective date(s) 05/03/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Effective date(s) 05/03/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the TBI to contract with the FBI on certain background investigations; revises the background check procedure for child care agencies. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 6; Title 68, Chapter 102 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38, Chapter 6; Title 68, Chapter 102 and Title 71, relative to background checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Effective date(s) 05/03/2022 | |
2022-05-06 | Pub. Ch. 977 | |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-17 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/14/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2211 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 977