TN SB2331 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 902
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 902
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes any nonprofit organization owning any vehicle that may be legally operated upon the streets or highways of this state with a regular vehicle registration to operate or move, through an authorized agent or employee, the vehicle upon any highway of the state without registering the vehicle; requires display of a special purpose plate issued to the owner. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, authorizes any nonprofit organization owning any vehicle that may be legally operated upon the streets or highways of this state with a regular vehicle registration to operate or move, through an authorized agent or employee, the vehicle upon any highway of the state without registering the vehicle; requires display of a special purpose plate issued to the owner. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 902 | |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/7/2016 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/28/2016 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/14/2016 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/14/2016 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/7/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2411 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 902