TN SB2321 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases monthly expense allowance used to defray expenses necessitated in connection with a member's official duties when away from the seat of government from $1,000 to $2,000. - Amends TCA Section 3-1-106.
Title
As introduced, increases monthly expense allowance used to defray expenses necessitated in connection with a member's official duties when away from the seat of government from $1,000 to $2,000. - Amends TCA Section 3-1-106.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2390 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee