TN SB2291 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands, beyond just student performance in English language arts (ELA) on the most recent Tennessee comprehensive assessment program (TCAP) test, the measures of student growth in ELA that an LEA or public charter school may use in determining whether certain fourth-grade students show adequate growth in ELA; requires LEAs and public charter schools to convene a parent-teacher conference for purposes of determining whether a student who does not show adequate growth in ELA must receive or participate in certain interventions or be retained in fourth grade. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to student performance.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2491 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-06 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee