TN SB2289 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 914
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 914
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions regarding cooperative purchasing agreements and county government purchasing in regard to the utilization of pricing discounts. - Amends TCA Title 12, Chapter 3, Part 10.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions regarding cooperative purchasing agreements and county government purchasing in regard to the utilization of pricing discounts. - Amends TCA Title 12, Chapter 3, Part 10.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Faulk [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Pub. Ch. 914 | |
2012-05-15 | Effective date(s) 05/10/12 | |
2012-05-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-30 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2012-04-29 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-04-27 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-04-25 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2012-04-23 | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 1 | |
2012-04-23 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0872) | |
2012-04-23 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2012-04-09 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2012-04-05 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2012-04-05 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2012-04-05 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0867) | |
2012-04-03 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/5/2012 | |
2012-03-27 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-03-06 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/13/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-28 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/28/2012 | |
2012-02-21 | Action def. in S. S&L Gov. Comm. to 2/28/12 | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/21/2012 | |
2012-01-13 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2012-01-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2425 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 914