TN SB2247 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2022 - 75% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the state textbook and instructional materials quality commission to provide a copy of the commission's proposed textbook and instructional materials list to the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 49 and Chapter 264 of the Acts of 1909.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39; Title 49 and Chapter 264 of the Acts of 1909, relative to educational materials.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 60 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-23SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2022-05-17HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2022-05-12SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2022-05-11SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2022-04-28HouseConf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 60, Nays 25 PNV 3
2022-04-28SenateConference Committee report adopted, Ayes 21, Nays 11
2022-04-27HouseConf. comm. appointed. (J. Sexton, Powers, Russell, McKenzie)
2022-04-27SenateConference Committee appointed. (Bell, Gilmore, Lundberg)
2022-04-27SenateSenate refused to recede from amendment
2022-04-27HouseH. refused to recede from ad. H. am. no. 3
2022-04-27SenateSenate refused to concur in amendment
2022-04-27SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar 2 for 4/27/2022
2022-04-27HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 66, Nays 26, PNV 0
2022-04-27HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0595)
2022-04-27HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0581)
2022-04-27HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA1012)
2022-04-27HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2022-04-14HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2022-04-12SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2022-04-12SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 1
2022-04-12SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0855)
2022-04-07SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/12/2022
2022-03-30SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2022-03-29SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/30/2022
2022-03-29SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/30/2022
2022-03-23SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2022
2022-03-23SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/30/2022
2022-03-16SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/23/2022
2022-03-16SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/23/2022
2022-03-09SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022
2022-03-02SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/16/2022
2022-02-23SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/2/2022
2022-02-03SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2022-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2022-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2666 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-27 - Sponsor(s) Added.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback