TN SB2233 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from six to seven hours, the training required in medication administration from a registered nurse for those unlicensed persons employed by licensed agencies to assist children and youth with the self-administration of medication in a group home setting without being subject to nursing licensure and other nursing requirements. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, increases from six to seven hours, the training required in medication administration from a registered nurse for those unlicensed persons employed by licensed agencies to assist children and youth with the self-administration of medication in a group home setting without being subject to nursing licensure and other nursing requirements. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2827 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Health Subcommittee of Health Committee