TN SB2222 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 794
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 794
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes that it is unlawful for a person to intentionally initiate or circulate a report of a past, present, or impending active shooter and hostage situation, knowing that the report is false or baseless if certain information is known at the time. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to criminal offenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Lowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 794 | |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/8/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2395 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024