TN SB2205 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 840
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 840
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes the requirement that the credentials held by a person to practice as a central service technician must have been administered by the International Association of Healthcare Central Service Material Management or the Certification Board for Sterile Processing and Distribution, Inc.; allows an individual the option to obtain a certified sterile processing and distribution technician credential instead of a certified registered central service technician credential. - Amends TCA Section 68-11-239.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 68-11-239, relative to central service technicians.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommend for passage with amendment, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommend for passage with amendment, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 840 | |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health & Welfare Committee to next calendar |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2857 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-25 - Effective date(s) 04/19/2022