TN SB2183 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 82, Nays 3 PNV 0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 82, Nays 3 PNV 0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from 10 days to 10 business days, the maximum amount of time the commissioner of education can suspend schools in a year when the commissioner requires all teachers to attend county institutes or educational meetings. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] |
Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Adam Lowe [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 82 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 82, Nays 3 PNV 0 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2326 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-30 - Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.