TN SB2183 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires any internet service provider that provides internet to the state to provide a net neutral internet service. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 12; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires any internet service provider that provides internet to the state to provide a net neutral internet service. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 12; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
2018-03-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/20/2018
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2018
2018-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2253 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-13 - Failed in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback