TN SB2131 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Private Prison Alignment Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 12 and Title 41.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Private Prison Alignment Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 12 and Title 41.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2676 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-14 - Failed for lack of motion in: State Government Subcommittee