TN SB2112 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 609
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 609
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires apportionment and distribution of sales and use tax revenue of certain hotels in an amount equal to the amount of such revenue derived from sales of goods or services on the premises of the hotel or inn, excluding revenue derived from the increases in such taxes from 5.5 to 7 percent; revenue so distributed may only be used to retire debt incurred prior to April 1, 2009, in renovating the hotel or inn and will continue only until the debt is retired. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, requires apportionment and distribution of sales and use tax revenue of certain hotels in an amount equal to the amount of such revenue derived from sales of goods or services on the premises of the hotel or inn, excluding revenue derived from the increases in such taxes from 5.5 to 7 percent; revenue so distributed may only be used to retire debt incurred prior to April 1, 2009, in renovating the hotel or inn and will continue only until the debt is retired. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Faulk [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-18 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-16 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 609 | |
2009-06-18 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0781) | |
2009-06-18 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2009-06-18 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (2) cal. for 06/18/2009 | |
2009-06-18 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 0 | |
2009-06-18 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/18/2009 | |
2009-06-16 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 6-17-09 | |
2009-06-16 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/16/2009 | |
2009-06-15 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/16/2009 | |
2009-06-15 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/15/2009 | |
2009-06-12 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/12/2009 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/12/2009 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/11/2009 | |
2009-06-10 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/10/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/10/2009 | |
2009-06-04 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/09/2009 | |
2009-06-02 | Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. w/neg recommend. - no second | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 06/02/2009 | |
2009-05-19 | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. to next cal. | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 05/19/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. to next cal. | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Action def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to last cal. | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 04/01/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. | |
2009-03-02 | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2009-02-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2038 (Crossfiled) 2009-07-16 - Pub. Ch. 609