TN SB2103 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 69, Nays 23 PNV 0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 69, Nays 23 PNV 0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes the provision requiring that the measure of the franchise tax must not be less than the actual value of the real or tangible property owned or used by a taxpayer in this state; authorizes the commissioner of revenue to issue refunds under certain conditions to taxpayers who properly file a claim for refund for taxes paid under that provision. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 1 and Title 67, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 1 and Title 67, Chapter 4, relative to franchise taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Sen. Brent Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 25 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 20 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Table Amend# 4 by Senator Campbell (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 25 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 20 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Table Amend# 4 by Senator Campbell (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 69, Nays 23 PNV 0 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted, Aye 25, Nay 6 |
2024-04-18 | House | Conf. comm. appointed. (Lamberth, WIlliams, Hazlewood, G. Hicks, Miller) |
2024-04-18 | House | H. refused to recede from H am. no. 1 |
2024-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/18/2024 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed (Johnson, Akbari, Stevens, Watson, Yager). |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from amendment 1 (HA-0898) |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-15 | House | H. refused to recede from am. no. 1 SB2103 |
2024-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in amendment |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-08 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 68, Nays 20, PNV 8 |
2024-04-08 | House | Failed to adopt, Ayes 25, Nays 68, PNV 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0965) |
2024-04-08 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0898) |
2024-04-08 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-25 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 6 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0664) |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Amendment tabled (Amendment 4 - SA0754) |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Amendment tabled (Amendment 3 - SA0753) |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0733) |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation, as amended |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1893 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Sponsor(s) Added.