TN SB2091 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 531
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 531
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires compliance with federal law regarding third-party liability. - Amends TCA Section 71-05-117.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 71-05-117, relative to third parties for medical services.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 531 | |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/26/2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1691 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Effective date(s) 03/07/2024