TN SB2076 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 512
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 512
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the Tennessee Adult Protection Act's definition of abuse or neglect to include certain situations when an adult is unable to maintain the adult's own health or welfare. - Amends TCA Section 71-6-102.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 71-6-102, relative to abuse or neglect of adults.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] |
Sen. Randy McNally [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 512 | |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/13/2024 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1680 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Effective date(s) 02/28/2024