TN SB2073 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes revisions to the Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organization (RICO) Act of 1989, including expanding the definition of racketeering activity. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 12, Part 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 12, Part 2, relative to the "Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organization (RICO) Act of 1989."
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2097 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee