TN SB2042 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates an offense of using force or coercion to cause a person to join a criminal gang against the person's will; sets penalty based on the age of the victim. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, creates an offense of using force or coercion to cause a person to join a criminal gang against the person's will; sets penalty based on the age of the victim. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1815 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020