TN SB2030 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 914
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 914
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Stolen Valor Act". - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 16, Part 3 and Section 58-1-602.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Stolen Valor Act". - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 16, Part 3 and Section 58-1-602.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] | Sen. Steve Southerland [R] | Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] | Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 3 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 3 BY VAN HUSS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 3 BY VAN HUSS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Pub. Ch. 914 | |
2018-05-08 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2018 | |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 (Amendment 3 - HA1177) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-11 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA1177) |
2018-04-11 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1143) |
2018-04-11 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1064) |
2018-04-11 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-12 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0667) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/8/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2130 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 914