TN SB2027 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 766
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 766
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits the employment of certain medical professionals by charitable clinics. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 11; Title 63, Chapter 5; Title 63, Chapter 6; Title 63, Chapter 8 and Title 63, Chapter 9.
Title
As enacted, permits the employment of certain medical professionals by charitable clinics. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 11; Title 63, Chapter 5; Title 63, Chapter 6; Title 63, Chapter 8 and Title 63, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 766 | |
2016-04-26 | Effective date(s) 04/19/2016 | |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-04 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-04-04 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1004) |
2016-04-04 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-03-17 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0669) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/14/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health & Welfare Committee to 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2016 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health & Welfare Committee to 3/2/2106 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/10/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2006 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 766