TN SB2021 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner to notify each LEA when the office of research and education accountability publishes a report germane to kindergarten through grade 12 education. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2092 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-05 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration