TN SB2011 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 762
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 762
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the division of TennCare to ensure that a non-opioid drug approved by the United States food and drug administration for the treatment or management of pain is not disadvantaged or discouraged with respect to coverage relative to an opioid or narcotic drug for the treatment or management of pain on the preferred drug list; makes other changes regarding the use of opioids and non-opioid drugs. - Amends TCA Title 53; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 53; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to the use of drugs for the treatment of pain.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 762 | |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/21/2024 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2903 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024