TN SB2010 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 396
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 396
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, exempts Wilson County from the requirement that appeals from the Probate Court (i.e., General Sessions Court acting as the Probate Court) must be heard anew in Chancery Court de novo. - Amends TCA Section 30-2-609.
Title
As enacted, exempts Wilson County from the requirement that appeals from the Probate Court (i.e., General Sessions Court acting as the Probate Court) must be heard anew in Chancery Court de novo. - Amends TCA Section 30-2-609.
Sponsors
Sen. Mae Beavers [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-17 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 396 | |
2009-05-28 | Comp. HB subst. | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 05/28/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Rec. for pass; ref to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/20/2009 | |
2009-05-19 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/20/2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/19/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Action def. in Jud. Comm to 5-12-09 | |
2009-05-05 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-05-01 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/05/2009 | |
2009-02-26 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-24 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1592 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-17 - Pub. Ch. 396