TN SB2006 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 885
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 885
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires bounty hunters to wear clothing that clearly identifies the person as a bounty hunter and prominently displays the words "bounty hunter" any time a bounty hunter is engaged in the functions of bounty hunting. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40, Chapter 11.
Title
As enacted, requires bounty hunters to wear clothing that clearly identifies the person as a bounty hunter and prominently displays the words "bounty hunter" any time a bounty hunter is engaged in the functions of bounty hunting. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40, Chapter 11.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 885 | |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/19/18 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/18/18 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2039 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 885