TN SB1994 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 04/11/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 04/11/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes that in Knox County one magistrate judge must be appointed by a majority of the county's general sessions judges and the length of their term is decided by a majority of the county's general sessions judges; specifies the magistrates' duties as issuing arrest warrants and setting bonds. - Amends TCA Section 40-1-111.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 40-1-111, relative to magistrates in certain counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Effective date(s) 04/11/2024 | |
2024-04-17 | Pub. Ch. 683 | |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-03-28 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-25 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-03-25 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/11/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2024 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2360 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 683