TN SB1974 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the manufacture, sale, or delivery, holding, or offering for sale of any livestock carcass, part of any livestock carcass, or meat food product that was derived or prepared from livestock that received an mRNA vaccine or vaccine material unless the product labeling contains a conspicuous notification, in a type size of not less than 10 point font, that the product was derived or prepared from livestock that received an mRNA vaccine or vaccine material. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 53.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 53, relative to meat.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/6/2024 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2708 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee