TN SB1972 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the frequency required for newspaper publication of a notice of the existence of a victims' compensation escrow fund from once every three months to twice every six months. - Amends TCA Title 24 and Title 29.
Title
As introduced, changes the frequency required for newspaper publication of a notice of the existence of a victims' compensation escrow fund from once every three months to twice every six months. - Amends TCA Title 24 and Title 29.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2008 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee