TN SB1969 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Effective date(s) 05/28/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Effective date(s) 05/28/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the court that finds a person incompetent to stand trial for a criminal offense due to intellectual disability to also determine whether the person is subject to involuntary care and treatment at the hearing in which the person is declared incompetent; states that the district attorney general is not required to file a complaint to require involuntary care and treatment for a person who is found incompetent to stand trial due to intellectual disability in order to commit the person. - Amends TCA Section 33-5-403.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 33-5-403, relative to persons found incompetent to stand trial.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Effective date(s) 05/28/2024 | |
2024-05-31 | Pub. Ch. 1031 | |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-05-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 8, PNV 0 |
2024-04-24 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1022) |
2024-04-24 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 3 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0952) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2024 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2024 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2693 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-31 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1031