TN SB1951 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows TCRS members who served in the armed forces during certain periods of armed conflict to establish retirement credit for the military service under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Section 8-34-605.
Title
As introduced, allows TCRS members who served in the armed forces during certain periods of armed conflict to establish retirement credit for the military service under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Section 8-34-605.
Sponsors
Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1979 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee