TN SB1927 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Tennessee rural teachers scholarship. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
As introduced, creates the Tennessee rural teachers scholarship. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1848 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee