TN SB1905 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, states that an order of protection issued by a general sessions court or other official remains in effect during the appeal to circuit or chancery court unless otherwise ordered by the general sessions judge or official. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6.
Title
AN ACT to to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6, relative to appeals.
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Sen. Page Walley [R] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2168 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-22 - Signed by Governor.